THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 5:23:32 AM
Qaderi, Ashley Raj
CPSO#:
97525
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Feb 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Feb 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Malhotra, Ashley Raj (used until: 09 Oct 2012 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Birmingham, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON L7M4Y1
Phone: 905-592-3946
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:07 Jan 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ASHLEY RAJ QADERI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QADERI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 04 Jun 2012 to 22 Jun 2012
EL - Psychiatry
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 13 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 14 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 12 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jun 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Jan 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Feb 2014 |