THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 2:58:29 AM
Kaushal, Amit
CPSO#:
97520
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 May 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 May 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Nephrology
200 Elizabeth Street, Room 8N-861
M5G2C4
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3889
Fax: 416-340-4999
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Oct 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:21 Sep 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AMIT KAUSHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAUSHAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 31 May 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
EL - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 31 May 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 May 2013 |