THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 8:44:57 AM
Loh, James Alexander
CPSO#:
97494
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
17 Oct 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
25 Aug 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 21 May 2012 to 01 Jun 2012
EL - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
University of Toronto, 30 Jul 2012 to 10 Aug 2012
EL - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
University of Toronto, 25 Aug 2014 to 19 Sep 2014
EL - Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 20 Sep 2014 to 17 Oct 2014
EL - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 May 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Aug 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Oct 2014 |