THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 22:34:45 PM
Alderbas, Sarah M Y J D J
CPSO#:
97492
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Sep 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Sep 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Kuwait University Faculty of Medicine, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
CAMH
250 College St, Toronto, ON
Toronto ON M5T 1L8
Phone: 416 535 8501
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Yukon
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cornwall General Hospital |
Cornwall |
Homewood Health Centre |
Guelph |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:31 Aug 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SARAH M Y J D J ALDERBAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALDERBAS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 16 May 2012 to 07 Aug 2012
PEAP - R - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 08 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 07 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 08 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 07 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 08 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 07 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 08 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 04 Sep 2018
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 05 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 02 Sep 2019
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 16 May 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Sep 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Sep 2019 |