THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 21:15:40 PM
Hanlan, Amy Katherine Lindsey
CPSO#:
97471
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 Feb 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical Sch, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:GF Strong Rehabilitation Centre
4255 Laurel St
Vancouver, BC V5Z 2G9
Phone: 604-734-1313
Date Received: 23 May 2018
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 07 May 2012 to 03 Jun 2012
EL - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Ottawa, 11 Mar 2014 to 05 May 2014
EL - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 May 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Mar 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 May 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Feb 2017 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |