THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 15:44:01 PM
Toor, Jaspreet Kaur
CPSO#:
97431
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jul 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Punjabi University, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Welland County General Hospital
Niagara Health System
65 Third St
Welland ON L3B 4W6
Phone: 4164536476
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System - Welland Site |
Welland |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:10 May 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JASPREET KAUR TOOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOOR is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Apr 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Apr 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 12 Apr 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Dec 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 2014 |