THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 17:35:26 PM
Ndubisi, Ihuoma Ugonna
CPSO#:
97426
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Mar 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Mar 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Ibo
Education: University of Lagos, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1190 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON N8W 1B4
Phone: (519) 252-3335
Fax: (519) 252-1529
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:03 May 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. IHUOMA UGONNA NDUBISI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NDUBISI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Apr 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Apr 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 11 Apr 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Oct 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Mar 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Mar 2015 |