skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 05/08/21 22:34:26 PM

Chisick, Laura Beth

CPSO#: 97411

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Dec 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:31 Dec 2014 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective:21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 05 Apr 2012 to 02 May 2012
EL - Hematology

University Of Toronto, 01 Dec 2014 to 01 Jun 2015
EL - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 May 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jun 2015