THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 10:33:22 AM
Manson, Neil Anderson
CPSO#:
97392
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jun 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Brunswick
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:16 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NEIL ANDERSON MANSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANSON is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Apr 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Apr 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 May 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 May 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Sep 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 May 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 May 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jun 2018 |