THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/12/23 7:53:32 AM
Park, Elena
CPSO#:
97371
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Aug 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Aug 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Tamarkina, Elena (used until: 20 Jul 2016 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Obstetrics and
Gynecology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-3232
Electoral District: 06
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Elena Park Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 11 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Sep 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gynecologic Oncology |
Effective:27 Sep 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ELENA PARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 02 Apr 2012 to 30 Apr 2012
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Apr 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Aug 2016 |