skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 28/06/22 16:45:18 PM

Josan, Kiranbir

CPSO#: 97337

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 05 Mar 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. K Josan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 15 2016
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2

Cardio Study
Suite 401
8333 Weston Road
Woodbridge ON  L4L 6M2

PACE Cardiology
Suite 302
11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Date Received: 03 Jun 2016


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:07 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:12 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016