THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 10:41:05 AM
Pietrus, Teresa
CPSO#:
97331
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
19 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Apr 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:RSRS
111 St. Regis Cres. S.
Toronto, Ont M3J 1Y6
Date Received: 19 May 2022
Instructions/Address:Patients should contact RSRS at 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 12 Mar 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Apr 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Jul 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 12 Jul 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 19 May 2022 |