THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 11:31:20 AM
Lam, Elaine Ming-Yu
CPSO#:
97320
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
29 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 12 Mar 2012 to 09 Apr 2012
EL - Colorectal Surgery
University of Toronto, 08 Apr 2013 to 05 May 2013
EL - Surgical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Mar 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Apr 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Apr 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 May 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 29 Jul 2015 |