THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 19:13:33 PM
Movsesyan, Arakel
CPSO#:
97316
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Mar 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Mar 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Armenian, English, Russian
Education: Xavier University School of Medicine, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Gage Medical clinic
1050 Upper Gage ave unit 3
Hamilton ON L8V5B7
Phone: (905) 393-6520
Fax: (905) 393-0818
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Mar 2012 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Mar 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 31 Aug 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Feb 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 May 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Aug 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 20 Aug 2014 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Aug 2014 |
|
Active |