THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 21:52:06 PM
Ndubisi, Chukwulo Christopher
CPSO#:
97315
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
14 Sep 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
19 Jul 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: C.C. Ndubisi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 3 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 15 Mar 2016 to 18 Jul 2016
AVP - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 19 Jul 2016 to 14 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Mar 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 28 Feb 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Nov 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Jul 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Feb 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Feb 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 15 Mar 2016 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Sep 2016 |