THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 6:12:48 AM
Anderson, Jesse Coleman Benjamin
CPSO#:
97301
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
07 Aug 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
25 Jan 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Timmins and District Hospital
425 Algonquin Blvd E
Timmins ON P4N 1B5
Date Received: 15 Nov 2017
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
British Columbia
USA - Vermont
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 26 Feb 2012 to 07 Apr 2012
EL - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Feb 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Apr 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 2014 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 29 Jul 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Oct 2016 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 Aug 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jan 2018 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Aug 2019 |