THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 16:59:07 PM
Saeed, Akhter
CPSO#:
97290
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Feb 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
15 Feb 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: University of the Punjab, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON N7T 6S3
Phone: (519) 464-4500 Ext. 5214
Electoral District: 01
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Akhter Saeed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 15 2019
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
USA - Ohio
USA - Wisconsin
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Feb 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Feb 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 14 Aug 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Aug 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 01 Aug 2013 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Aug 2013 |
|
Active |