THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 9:40:53 AM
Fan, Xiangning
CPSO#:
97288
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
06 Feb 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
12 Jan 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Occupational Medicine |
Effective:21 Sep 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 27 Feb 2012 to 16 Mar 2012
EL - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 12 Jan 2015 to 06 Feb 2015
EL - Occupational Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Feb 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Mar 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jan 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Feb 2015 |