skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/07/21 15:33:32 PM

Al Zahrani, Atif Hussain Ali

CPSO#: 97277

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 Mar 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Saudi Arabia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jan 2012 to 23 Mar 2012
PEAP - CF - Cardiology

McMaster University, 24 Mar 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
CF - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2017