skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/10/21 17:16:37 PM

Shobola, Oladayo Davidson

CPSO#: 97265

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Apr 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 22 Apr 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education:University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite105
700 Tecumseh Road East
N8X 4T2
Windsor ON  N8X 4T2
Phone: (519)255-6629
Fax: (519)253-9224 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
Department of Psychiatry
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Canada
Phone: 519973-4411 Ext. 33223
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:22 Apr 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Feb 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jan 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Nov 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Apr 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Apr 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Oct 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 May 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Sep 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Sep 2017 Active
             Dr. Oladayo Davidson Shobola may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.