THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 9:22:57 AM
Park, Sunkyu
CPSO#:
97250
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Apr 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Rosalind Franklin University of Med.& Sc, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
150 sherway drive
Etobicoke ON M9C 1A5
Phone: 416 259 6671
Fax: 416 521 4082
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:03 Nov 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SUNKYU PARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 13 Feb 2012 to 11 Mar 2012
EL - Hematology
University of Ottawa, 27 Aug 2012 to 23 Sep 2012
EL - Hematology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 29 Jan 2016
CF - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Feb 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Mar 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Aug 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Sep 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Apr 2015 |