THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 2:25:37 AM
Gopidasan, Balaji
CPSO#:
97225
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Jan 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
27 Jan 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: Tamil Nadu Dr. M.G.R. Medical University, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock Hospital
Woodstock ON N4V 0A4
Phone: 5194214223
Fax: 5194214247
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Pennsylvania
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
Woodstock Hospital |
Woodstock |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry |
Effective:21 Sep 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Jan 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Jan 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 26 Jul 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 May 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 May 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 12 Jul 2013 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 May 2013 |
|
Active |