skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 01/08/21 6:50:37 AM

Labban, Atif Ahmed Ali

CPSO#: 97224

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 24 Mar 2012
PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 25 Mar 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 31 Jan 2013
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015