THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 10:50:40 AM
Pace-Asciak, Pia Zahra
CPSO#:
97207
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Aug 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Aug 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
600 University Ave
Mount Sinai Hospital
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:07 Mar 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PIA ZAHRA PACE-ASCIAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PACE-ASCIAK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 16 Jan 2012 to 24 Feb 2012
EL - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jan 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Feb 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 2020 |