THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 0:01:34 AM
Chubbs, Christopher Scott
CPSO#:
97134
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Jul 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON L9R 1W7
Phone: (705) 435 6281
Fax: (705) 434 5142
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: C. S. Chubbs Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 23 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Stevenson Memorial Hospital |
Alliston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:26 Feb 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER SCOTT CHUBBS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUBBS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Dec 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 2014 |
Concerns
Source:
Other
Active Date: December 20, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
FINDINGS OF GUILT
Christopher Chubbs was found guilty of the following offence:
1. Impaired operation of a motor vehicle, contrary to Section 253(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
DATE: December 13, 2018
SENTENCE: 12 month driving prohibition; Fine of $1800; Victim surcharge of $540