THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 8:04:14 AM
Potvin, Nadine Susan
CPSO#:
97112
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Sep 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Sep 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
105 Shipley Street
Clinton ON N0M1L0
Phone: 519-482-3000
Fax: 519-482-7648
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Clinton Public Hospital |
Clinton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Jun 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NADINE SUSAN POTVIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POTVIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 02 Jan 2012 to 15 Jan 2012
EL - Geriatric Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jan 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Jan 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Sep 2018 |