THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/09/23 0:02:23 AM
Ahmad, Semina
CPSO#:
97110
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Dec 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Dec 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Sint Eustatius, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 10
25 Woodbine Downs Boulevard
Etobicoke ON M9W 6N5
Phone: (416) 741-2273
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Dec 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SEMINA AHMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMAD is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Dec 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Dec 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 12 Dec 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Oct 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Oct 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Dec 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Dec 2016 |