THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 2:57:07 AM
Burman, Dmitriy Konstantinovich
CPSO#:
97107
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Dec 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
13 Dec 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Latvian, Russian, Ukrainian
Education: Riga Stradins University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
VIP2Care Pediatric Clinic
Unit 204
9983 Keele St
Maple ON L6A 3Y5
Phone: (905) 553-8553
Fax: (905) 553-8558
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
USA - Pennsylvania
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:13 Dec 2011 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Dec 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Dec 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 12 Jun 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Mar 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Dec 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Feb 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Mar 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 28 Mar 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Dec 2014 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Dec 2014 |
|
Active |