skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 31/07/21 23:15:07 PM

Ahmad, Ejaz

CPSO#: 97099

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Dec 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 11 Dec 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Punjabi University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Red River Clinic
425 Elgin Ave
Winnipeg MB
R3A 1P2
Winnipeg MB  R3B 2G4
Phone: (204) 417-8828
Fax: (204) 505-8883

Additional Practice Location(s)

11-794 Sargent Ave.
Winnipeg
MB
R3E 0B7
Winnipeg MB  R3E 0B7
Canada
Phone: 204-783-6430
Fax: 204-783-6493
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:20 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 22 Apr 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 22 Apr 2019 Active
                   
                  
            (1 of 2)
            As from April 22, 2019, the following is imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Ejaz Ahmad in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Ahmad to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                            DR. EJAZ AHMAD
                                             ("Dr. Ahmad")
                                                  to 
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Ahmad, certificate of registration number 97099, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Ahmad, acknowledge that the College received information from
                  another jurisdiction about my family medicine practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)         I, Dr. Ahmad, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                        Undertaking, effective immediately.

            (5)   I, Dr. Ahmad, undertake that I will not practice medicine in Ontario
                  until each and every one of the following conditions have been met: 

                  (a)   I provide a minimum of sixty (60) days' notice to the College of my
                        intent to return to the practice of medicine in Ontario; 
                  
                  (b)   I provide the College with proof that I am participating in a
                        program of continuing professional development that meets the
                        requirements for continuing professional development of the Royal
                        College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada, the College of Family
                        Physicians of Canada, or an organization that has been approved by
                        the College for that purpose that meets the requirements for
                        continuing professional development set by the Royal College of
                        Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family
                        Physicians of Canada;
                  
                  (c)   I provide the College with proof of any and all education that I
                        have completed since December 14, 2018; and 
                  
                  (d)   The College approves my return to the practice of medicine in
                        Ontario. 
                  
            (6)   I, Dr. Ahmad, undertake that upon my return to the practice of medicine
                  in Ontario, I shall, at minimum, submit to the following: 

            (7)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Ahmad, undertake that I will not engage in any of the
                        following areas of practice: 
                  
                        (i)   The performance of circumcisions or vasectomies at any
                              location;
                        (ii)  The performance of any surgical procedure, including but not
                              limited to surgical alteration or excision of lesions or
                              tissue, including for the purpose of examination, treatment
                              or diagnosis of a disease, except when encountered in an
                              Emergency Department in a hospital at which I have
                              privileges; 
                        (iii) The performance of any surgical dermatological procedures,
                              including but not limited to the removal of skin tags, benign
                              moles, and cysts, nevi, eborrheic keratosis, fibroepithelia
                              polyps, hemangioma and neurofibromata, except when
                              encountered in an Emergency Department in a hospital at which
                              I have privileges; and 
                        (iv)  The practice of medicine in any Premises, as defined under
                              section 44 of O Reg 114/94, made under the Medicine Act.
                  
            (8)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Ahmad, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the
                        College (the "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), for
                        six (6) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Ahmad, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Review the materials provided by the College and have an
                              initial meeting to discuss practice improvement
                              recommendations;
                        (ii)  Meet with me at my Practice Locations, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every two (2) weeks for at
                              least three (3) months ("Moderate-Level Supervision"). If my
                              Clinical Supervisor reports to the College that satisfactory
                              progress has been made during the period of Moderate-Level
                              Supervision, the College may, in its discretion, reduce the
                              degree of supervision to a low-level supervision ("Low-Level
                              Supervision"), during which time my Clinical Supervisor will
                              meet with me at my Practice Locations, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every month for a period of at
                              least three (3) months;
                        (iii) Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting;
                        (iv)  Ensure that patient charts are reviewed from each of my areas
                              of practice over the period of Clinical Supervision;
                        (v)   Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                        (vi)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                        (vii) Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                        (viii)Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Ahmad, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the information
                        provided by the College, and concerns that may arise during the
                        period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Ahmad, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Ahmad, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College no less than
                        twenty (20) days prior to the date that I plan to return to the
                        practice of medicine in Ontario, as approved by the College.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Ahmad, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Ahmad, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (8)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine in Ontario until such
                        time as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the
                        College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Ahmad, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise
                        as a result of section (8)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (9)   Reassessment of Practice
                  (a)   I, Dr. Ahmad, undertake that, approximately three (3) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (8)
                        above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors").
                        I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review, an
                        interview with me, direct observation of my care, interviews with
                        colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients and any other
                        tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Ahmad, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Ahmad, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may receive
                        and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss with the
                        Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the Reassessment. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Ahmad, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will
                        be provided to me and reported to the College and the Reassessment
                        may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
            (10)  Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Ahmad, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within twenty (20) days of commencing practice
                        at that location in any jurisdiction.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Ahmad, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions 
                        of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Ahmad, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Ahmad, acknowledge and agree that I will execute consent
                        forms for OHIP and NMS, in the form attached hereto as Appendix "B"
                        and Appendix "C", respectively, within fifteen (15) days of the
                        College approving my return to the practice of medicine in Ontario,
                        pursuant to section (5)(d) above. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (11)  I, Dr. Ahmad, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (12)  I, Dr. Ahmad, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (13)  I, Dr. Ahmad, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (14)  I, Dr. Ahmad, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

            (15)  I, Dr. Ahmad, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (16)  I, Dr. Ahmad, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (17)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Ahmad, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Ahmad, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (17)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        The College received information from another jurisdiction about
                        Dr. Ahmad's family medicine practice.  Based on the information,
                        Dr. Ahmad has agreed to provide notice to and obtain approval from
                        the College before commencing practice in Ontario.  
                  
                        In addition, Dr. Ahmad will not engage in any of the following
                        areas of practice in Ontario: 
                  
                        (i)   The performance of circumcisions or vasectomies at any
                              location;
                        (ii)  The performance of any surgical or surgical dermatological
                              procedures outside of a hospital setting; 
                        (iii) The practice of medicine in any Out-of-Hospital Premises.
                  
                        Upon commencing practice in Ontario, Dr. Ahmad will practise under
                        the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for
                        6 months. 
                  
                        Dr. Ahmad's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by
                        the College within 3 months of the end of the period of Clinical
                        Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (18)  I, Dr. Ahmad, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (19)  I, Dr. Ahmad, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into
                   this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of
                  my compliance with this Undertaking.
                  
            (20)  I, Dr. Ahmad, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   any information relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.
                  
                  
            (2 of 2 )
            As from December 11, 2011, the following term, condition and limitation is
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Ejaz Ahmad:

                  Dr. Ejaz Ahmad may practise medicine independently in primary care
                  (family practice), excluding anaesthesia.
                  

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: April 22, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Ejaz Ahmad to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 22, 2019:

The College received information from another jurisdiction about Dr. Ahmad's family medicine practice. Based on the information, Dr. Ahmad has agreed to provide notice to and obtain approval from the College before commencing practice in Ontario.

In addition, Dr. Ahmad will not engage in any of the following areas of practice in Ontario:

(i)The performance of circumcisions or vasectomies at any location;
(ii)The performance of any surgical or surgical dermatological procedures outside of a hospital setting;
(iii)The practice of medicine in any Out-of-Hospital Premises.

Upon commencing practice in Ontario, Dr. Ahmad will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months.

Dr. Ahmad's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 3 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.

 

Source: Other Canadian Colleges
Notice Type Discipline Findings in Other Jurisdictions
Active Date: December 14, 2018
Summary: Where a disciplinary finding is made against a member on or after September 1, 2015 by a medical regulatory or licensing authority in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding to be posted on the register, if the finding is known to the College. The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information: _ _ On December 14, 2018, the Inquiry Panel of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Manitoba ordered that Dr. Ahmad: (a) be reprimanded; (b) be suspended from the practice of medicine for five months effective October 15, 2018; (c) be indefinitely suspended from the practice of medicine until he completes a course on medical professionalism and ethics; and (d) be prohibited from performing circumcisions (this prohibition may be varied or deleted if he undergoes satisfactory formal training and education or is supervised when conducting circumcisions, and is assessed as being able to safely and competently perform circumcisions). Dr. Ahmad had pleaded guilty on October 15, 2018 to committing professional misconduct and to displaying a lack of knowledge, skill or judgment in the practice of medicine, specifically in his performance of circumcisions, behaviour in an unprofessional and unethical manner, and providing misleading information to the Manitoba College regarding the creation of medical records. The College learned of this finding on December 20, 2018.