THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 0:18:55 AM
Ghadieh, Omar M M
CPSO#:
97083
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Sep 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Oct 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Jordan University of Sci. & Technology, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
167 Rolph St
Tillsonburg ON N4G 3Y9
Phone: 519-842-3611
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital |
Tillsonburg |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:04 Oct 2019 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:04 Oct 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. OMAR M M GHADIEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHADIEH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2012 to 01 Mar 2012
PEAP - CF - Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Mar 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
CF - Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 23 Sep 2015
AVP - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 05 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 04 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 05 Oct 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2018 to 04 Oct 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 05 Oct 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2019 to 04 Oct 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology
Queen's University, 05 Oct 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2020 to 04 Oct 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Mar 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Dec 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Dec 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Oct 2016 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Oct 2019 |