skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/07/21 5:52:24 AM

Kalenga, Jean-Claude

CPSO#: 97049

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Nov 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Nov 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Kalenga, Mukengeshayi (used until: 29 Jan 2013 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Swahili

Education:Universite de Kinshasa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

51 Benton Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 3H1
Canada
Phone: 226-2403014
Fax: 844-6067321
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

245 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 3B7
Canada
Phone: 416-4881455
Fax: 416-4888846
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J. C. Kalenga Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 19 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kalenga ( CPSO# 97049 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Business Address:
Benton Medical Clinic
51 Benton Street
Kitchener ON  N2G 3H1
Phone Number: (226) 240-3014

Business Address:
245 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M4P 3B7
Phone Number: (416) 488-1455

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:02 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective:26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JEAN-CLAUDE KALENGA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KALENGA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2011