THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/03/23 18:41:14 PM
Dash, Satya
CPSO#:
97048
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Feb 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Mar 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Oriya
Education: St Bartholomew's & The Royal London Scho, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital, 12EN
Division of Adult Endocrinology
and Metabolism
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. X8094
Fax: 4163403314
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Mount Sinai Hospital |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 May 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:23 Sep 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SATYA DASH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DASH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 23 Nov 2011 to 14 Feb 2012
PEAP - CF - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 15 Feb 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
CF - Endocrinology and Metabolism
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 23 Nov 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Feb 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Feb 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Mar 2015 |