THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 9:20:20 AM
Duong, Hanh Heather
CPSO#:
97036
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jul 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Vietnamese
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 306, 220 Dundas Street West
Whitby ON L1N8M7
Phone: 9056659001
Fax: 9056659335
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HANH HEATHER DUONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUONG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 21 Nov 2011 to 19 Dec 2011
EL - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 13 Feb 2012 to 11 Mar 2012
EL - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 19 Nov 2012 to 16 Dec 2012
EL - Paediatric Nephrology
McMaster University, 26 Aug 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
EL - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2013 to 18 Oct 2013
EL - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Nov 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Dec 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Feb 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Mar 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Nov 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Dec 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Oct 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 2014 |