THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 16:52:38 PM
Lee, Andrea King Ying
CPSO#:
97013
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
11 Jul 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:LHSC University Hosipita
Heart Rhythm Program
C6 - 339 Windermere Rd
London ON N6A 5A5
Date Received: 17 May 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:16 Nov 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 21 Nov 2011 to 18 Dec 2011
EL - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 07 May 2012 to 01 Jun 2012
EL - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 26 Oct 2015 to 20 Nov 2015
EL - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 04 Jul 2017 to 29 Jun 2018
CF - Adult Cardiac Electrophysiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Nov 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Dec 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 May 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Oct 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Nov 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 2017 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Jun 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 2018 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2019 |