THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 20:44:42 PM
Krueger, Joerg Andreas
CPSO#:
97003
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jul 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, German
Education: Humboldt University of Berlin, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7500 Ext. 5327
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Germany
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:01 Jul 2015 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2011 to 13 Jan 2012
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 14 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jan 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2022 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2022 |
|
Active |