THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 20:09:40 PM
Al-Juaid, Alaa Mohammed N
CPSO#:
97001
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
31 Jan 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
07 Jan 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Umm Al-Qura University Faculty of Medici, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 03 Nov 2011 to 30 Nov 2011
EL - Paediatric Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2012 to 23 Nov 2012
EL - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2013 to 31 Jan 2013
EL - Paediatric Infectious Diseases
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Nov 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Nov 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jan 2013 |