skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 02/08/21 7:38:02 AM

Zhu, Yanping

CPSO#: 96991

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Dec 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:West China Medical University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Oct 2011 to 09 Dec 2011
PEAP - CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 10 Dec 2011 to 31 Aug 2012
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2012