THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 6:55:01 AM
Kumar, Kamal
CPSO#:
96989
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
25 Jul 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Mysore University, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Anesthesia and
Perioperative Medicine
C2-168, 800 Commissioners Road East
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 55115
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance |
Chatham |
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital |
St Thomas |
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital |
Strathroy |
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital |
Tillsonburg |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:29 Jul 2022 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 28 Oct 2011 to 21 Dec 2011
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Dec 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Jun 2014
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 27 Oct 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Dec 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 Jul 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Feb 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2021 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jul 2022 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2021 |
|
Active |