THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 15:10:26 PM
Sawyer, Sarah Lynn
CPSO#:
96970
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Sep 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Aug 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
Department of Medical Genetics
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3804
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Medical Genetics and Genomics |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SARAH LYNN SAWYER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAWYER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 25 Oct 2011 to 21 Nov 2011
EL - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Ottawa, 26 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Aug 2013
CF - Medical Genetics and Genomics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Nov 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Sep 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2013 |