THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 23:02:54 PM
Sikand, Aman
CPSO#:
96969
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
31 Oct 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Oct 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 2010
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
William Osler Health System
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: (905) 494-6571
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:29 Oct 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:22 Dec 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AMAN SIKAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIKAND is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Oct 2011 to 17 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 18 Jan 2012 to 24 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 24 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 03 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jan 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Oct 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 2013 |