skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 05/08/21 7:58:23 AM

Saxena, Puja

CPSO#: 96948

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Oct 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Oct 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Chakerwarti, Puja (used until: 06 Feb 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:National University of Ireland, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
966 Dundas St. E. Unit 8A
Mississauga ON  L4Y4H5
Phone: 905 595 5030
Fax: 647 689 2014 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

169 Queen St. E. Suite 102
Brampton ON  L6V 1B3
Canada
Phone: 905 216 0663
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PUJA SAXENA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAXENA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Oct 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Oct 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2018