skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/10/21 20:43:47 PM

Ferreyra Galliani, Mariella

CPSO#: 96937

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Oct 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Oct 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad San Martin De Porres, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
418 Eglinton Avenue W
Toronto ON  M5N 1A2
Phone: 647-479-8410 Ext. 1
Fax: 647-689-3720 Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Peru

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARIELLA FERREYRA GALLIANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERREYRA GALLIANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 25 Oct 2011 to 16 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 17 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 21 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2013