THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 17:15:28 PM
Zhang, Wenli
CPSO#:
96931
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Oct 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Oct 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Mandarin
Education: Shandong University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
1650 Elgin Mills Road East
Richmond Hill ON L4S 0B2
Phone: (905) 780-0778
Fax: (905) 780-7969
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:10 Oct 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WENLI ZHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHANG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 25 Oct 2011 to 16 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 17 Jan 2012 to 24 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 25 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 21 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jan 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Oct 2013 |