THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 4:58:32 AM
Goldman, Adam Zale
CPSO#:
96914
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Nov 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Nov 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Ben-Gurion University of the Negev Facul, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Temmy Latner Centre for Palliative
Care
Mt. Sinai Hospital
60 Murray St - 4th Floor
Toronto ON M5T 3L9
Phone: 416-586-4800 Ext. 7884
Fax: 416-586-4804
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:30 Oct 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ADAM ZALE GOLDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2011 to 22 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Jan 2012 to 30 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jan 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Oct 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Nov 2013 |