THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 2:12:59 AM
Duncombe, Jayde Calah
CPSO#:
96913
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Nov 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Oct 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Ross University School of Medicine, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
OakMed Family Health Team
Suite 110
231 Oak Park Boulevard
Oakville ON L6H 7S8
Phone: (905) 901-5111
Fax: (905) 901-5122
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:10 Oct 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAYDE CALAH DUNCOMBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUNCOMBE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Nov 2011 to 23 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 24 Jan 2012 to 31 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Nov 2012 to 31 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jan 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Oct 2013 |