THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 10:57:18 AM
Hadi, Annie Zehra
CPSO#:
96909
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jun 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Urdu
Education: Saba University School of Medicine, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
12-1700 King Rd
Improved Care
King City ON L7B 0N1
Phone: 9058338421
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Jun 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANNIE ZEHRA HADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HADI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2011 to 22 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 15 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 16 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 16 Dec 2014 to 11 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 12 Jan 2015 to 21 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jan 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 2015 |