skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/10/21 12:02:24 PM

Takhar, Anjli

CPSO#: 96904

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Oct 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Oct 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St. George's University School of Medici, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Providence Healthcare
3276 St. Clair Ave East
Toronto ON  M1L 1W1
Phone: 4162853666 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Providence Health Care,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:02 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANJLI TAKHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAKHAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 31 Oct 2011 to 22 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2014