skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 28/10/21 10:41:33 AM

Tak, Auzair Ahmed

CPSO#: 96902

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Oct 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Oct 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
16 Andrew Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5R2
Phone: (519) 804-9234
Fax: (519) 804-2604 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Auzair Tak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Tak ( CPSO# 96902 )

Business Address:
16 Andrew Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5R2
Phone Number: (519) 804-2100

Business Address:
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 742-3611

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:10 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AUZAIR AHMED TAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Oct 2011 to 17 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 18 Jan 2012 to 24 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Oct 2012 to 24 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 15 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2013