skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/10/21 10:33:41 AM

Wahid, Salman

CPSO#: 96900

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Oct 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 12 Oct 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Dow Medical College, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
51 James snow Pkwy
Milton ON  L9E 0R3
Phone: (905) 636-1050 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S4L8
Canada
Phone: 9055259140
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

90 Resolution Drive, Unit 2
Brampton ON  L6W0A7
Canada
Phone: 1-855-854-7325
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

7600 Weston Road, Unit 55
Woodbridge ON  L4L8B7
Canada
Phone: 1-855-371-3500
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Canada
Phone: 519-749-4300
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

21 Sylvan Street West
Kenora ON  P9N 3W7
Canada
Phone: 8074689861
County: District of Kenora
Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Salman Wahid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wahid ( CPSO# 96900 )

Business Address:
51 James Snow Parkway
Milton ON  L9E 0R3

Business Address:
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4L8

Business Address:
90 Resolution Drive
Suite 2
Brampton ON  L6W 0A7

Business Address:
7600 Weston Road
Suite 55
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8B7


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:12 Oct 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Oct 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 11 Apr 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Jul 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 11 Jul 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 11 Jul 2014 Active
             Dr. Salman Wahid may practise medicine independently in psychiatry, only.