skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/10/21 9:57:08 AM

Choudhary, Badar Un Nisa

CPSO#: 96892

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Apr 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Apr 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of the Punjab, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200-785 Wonderland Road South
London ON  N6K 1M6
Phone: (519) 641-6712 Ext. 3096
Fax: (519) 641-6189 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Badar Choudhary Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Choudhary ( CPSO# 96892 )

Business Address:
200 - 785 Wonderland Road South
London ON  N6K 1M6
Phone Number: (519) 641-6712

Business Address:
Suite 102
140 Oxford Street East
London ON  N6A 1T3

Business Address:
200-785 Wonderland Rd S
London ON  N6K 1M6
Phone Number: 5196416712


Corporation Name: Dixon Cunningham-Dunlop Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 6 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:15 Apr 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BADAR UN NISA CHOUDHARY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOUDHARY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Oct 2011 to 17 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 18 Jan 2012 to 24 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 24 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2014